Hamilton lane board of directors
WebLeading private markets investment management firm Hamilton Lane announced today that its Board of Directors has elected Vann Graves as a new independent director, effective immediately. Graves’s appointment increases the size of the Board to seven directors, four of whom are independent directors. WebBoard of Directors Mike Roman Chairman of the Board & CEO 3M A Christine Sovereign Office Managing Director Accenture Jasmine Jirele CEO Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America Lisa Shannon President and CEO Allina Health James Cracchiolo Chairman & CEO Ameriprise Financial Chris Galvin Chairman & CEO Andersen Corporation …
Hamilton lane board of directors
Did you know?
WebBoard of Trustees Current Members, 2024-2024. Ted W. Beneski ’78, P'08 CEO and Managing Partner, Insight Equity Southlake, Texas. Jeffrey L. Bleich ’83 CEO, Dentons Diplomatic Solutions San Francisco, California. Sarah Bloom Raskin ’83, P’14, P’17 Rubinstein Fellow, Duke University Governor, Federal Reserve Board, 2010-2014 WebFeb 7, 2024 · BALA CYNWYD, Pa., March 02, 2024 (GLOBE NEWSWIRE) -- Leading private markets investment management firm Hamilton Lane (NASDAQ: HLNE) today announced the final closing of Hamilton Lane Strategic Opportunities Fund VI (“the Fund”). The Fund represents nearly $900 million in commitments from a wide range of global LPs.
WebMar 4, 2024 · Hamilton Lane announced that its Board of Directors has elected Vann Graves as a new independent director, effective immediately. Graves’s appointment …
WebMr. Hirsch is our Vice Chairman, a member of our board of directors and a Co-Chairman of various investment committees. Mr. Hirsch also serves as Chairman of HLA’s Investment Committee. Mr. Hirsch has served as our Vice Chairman since October 2016, and previously served as Chief Investment Officer from April 2003 to October 2016. WebMar 6, 2024 · March 6, 2024. Hamilton Lane Expands Presence in Asia, Opening an Office in Shanghai. February 15, 2024. HAMILTON LANE INCORPORATED REPORTS THIRD QUARTER FISCAL 2024 RESULTS, WITH MANAGEMENT & ADVISORY FEES GROWING BY 22% AND ASSETS UNDER MANAGEMENT GROWING BY 10% YEAR …
WebHamilton Lane - Public Investors - Corporate Governance - Board of Directors - Person Details Person Details View Event Details Atul Varma Atul Varma Mr. Varma is the Chief Financial Officer and Treasurer at Hamilton Lane. His responsibilities include the oversight of the Corporate Finance Department.
WebJames Jones Treasurer Founder – The JKT Financial Group, LLC. Yissel Barajas Secretary Chief Human Resources Officer – Reiter Affiliated Companies Shawn O’Hara Immediate Past Chair Principal – O’Hara Management Jed Harris President – Puretec Industrial Water Brad Bartlett Retired President – Dole Packaged Foods Peter Firestone robin branch facebookWebSep 25, 2024 · Appointment of Principal to Australian team Sydney, Sept 25, 2024 – Hamilton Lane (NASDAQ:HLNE), a leading global private markets asset management firm, has expanded its Australian presence and offerings to provide access to private markets to a wider group of investors, including the wholesale and high-net-worth (HNW) markets in … robin brandleyWebJul 13, 2015 · Cascade is the personal investment arm of Bill Gates, co-founder of Microsoft. Hamilton Lane entered into a partnership with Cascade in 2003, whereby Cascade acquired a minority stake and... robin braithwaite aiken scWebThe Cargill Foundation Staff: Michelle Grogg, Executive Director, The Cargill Foundation and Vice President, Corporate Responsibility. Katie Clark Sieben, Sr. Director, The Cargill Foundation and Corporate Responsibility. J.B. Scherpelz, Manager, Global Community and Employee Engagement. robin brandshaugWebFeb 7, 2024 · Hartley R. Rogers. Mr. Rogers is the Chairman of our Board of Directors, a Managing Director, and a member of various investment committees. Prior to joining … robin brainWebSep 10, 2024 · Hartley R. Rogers is the Chairman of Hamilton Lane. As such, he plays significant roles in the Firm’s investing and client relationship activities, as well as in its strategic and organizational development. He is a member of various Investment Committees of the Firm and is the Chairman of the Board of Directors. robin brandon-coffeyWebPortal Login. To access your Cobalt LP, iLevel or Investor Portal account, please click the corresponding link below. Cobalt. iLevel. Investor Portal robin branch